Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clemente Cardinal Micara

Deceased

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1879Born
20 Sep 190222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 May 192040.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
15 May 192040.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czechoslovakia
8 Aug 192040.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
30 May 192343.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 May 192343.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
18 Feb 194666.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194666.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
18 Feb 194666.1ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
22 Feb 194666.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
13 Jun 194666.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri
11 Nov 195070.8AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
26 Jan 195171.0AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Jan 195373.0ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
11 Mar 196585.2DiedPro-Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Clemente Micara (VIAF: 84464552)
Clemente Cardinal Micara (born , died ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 60
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 47
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 66, and Page 67, and Page 83
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 171
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 263, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 345, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 364, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 423, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 493, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 577, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 677, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 725, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 858, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,096, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast