Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Figueroa Cervantes

Auxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

Titular Bishop of Lamasba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1975 Born
21 Jun 200328.1Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
29 May 202146.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
29 May 202146.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamasba
28 Aug 202146.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamasba

MicroData Summary for Francisco Figueroa Cervantes
Bishop Francisco Figueroa Cervantes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJiquilpan, Diocese of Zamora, Michoacán
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Co-Cathedral, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora, Michoacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jun 2021
  • c2: CB, 27 Aug 2021
  • c1+: CB, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Aug 2021

Quantcast