Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Humberto Paparoni

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1920Born
8 Apr 194423.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 195434.0AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
8 Dec 195434.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
1 Oct 195939.0DiedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Humberto Paparoni
Bishop José Humberto Paparoni (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz de Mora

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast