Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Roa Pérez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Maracaibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1915BornEl Cobre
12 Apr 194126.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 195742.6AppointedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
24 Nov 195742.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
16 Jan 196145.9AppointedBishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
30 Apr 196651.2AppointedArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
23 Dec 199277.8RetiredArchbishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
1 Jan 200084.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Maracaibo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Domingo Roa Pérez:
Archbishop Domingo Roa Pérez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maracaibo

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014