Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Enrique Torres Rondón

Bishop of San Fernando de Apure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1950 BornMaracaibo
25 Jul 197626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Jul 201363.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Jul 201363.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
13 Sep 201363.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura
15 Jul 201666.3AppointedBishop of San Fernando de Apure, Venezuela
8 Oct 201666.5InstalledBishop of San Fernando de Apure, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Enrique Torres Rondón
Bishop Alfredo Enrique Torres Rondón (born ) Bishop of San Fernando de Apure

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Fernando de Apure.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,867
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2016
  • i: CB, 5 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016