Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lai Hung-seng

Bishop Emeritus of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1946 Born
28 Oct 197226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Macau, China
23 Jan 200155.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
2 Jun 200155.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
30 Jun 200357.4SucceededBishop of Macau, China
16 Jan 201670.0ResignedBishop of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for José Lai Hung-seng
Bishop José Lai Hung-seng (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacau, Diocese of Macau
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,982
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2016
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast