Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Diego Núñez de Figueroa

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Macau, China


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jan 1576AppointedBishop of Macau, China
27 Oct 1578ResignedBishop-Elect of Macau, China
28 Jun 1613DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Diego Núñez de Figueroa
Father Diego Núñez de Figueroa (died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Macau

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast