Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Lam Ka Tseung

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1928Born
27 Dec 195325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Macau, China
26 May 198759.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
8 Sep 198759.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
6 Oct 198860.4SucceededBishop of Macau, China
30 Jun 200375.2RetiredBishop of Macau, China
27 Jul 200981.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Domingos Lam Ka Tseung
Bishop Domingos Lam Ka Tseung (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,158
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,415
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018