Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Pinto da Piedade, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564¹BornAbrantes, Portugal
30 Aug 160440.6AppointedBishop of Macau, China
Nov 1604³40.8Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
27 Aug 162662.6ResignedBishop of Macau, China
28 Jun 162864.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Pinto da Piedade:
Bishop Joćo Pinto da Piedade O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

  • a bishop for 23.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015