Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nicolaus Rodrigues Pereira de Borja, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777¹Born
1794²17.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
1817²40.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Apr 184366.2SelectedBishop of Macau, China
19 Jun 184366.4ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
28 Mar 184568.2DiedBishop-Elect of Macau, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Rodrigues Pereira de Borja
Father Nicolaus Rodrigues Pereira de Borja C.M. (born 1777, died ) Bishop-Elect of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorticada

  • a priest for 28.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,843
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast