Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Ilunga Kaseba

Deceased

Bishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1930Born
1 May 196029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Dec 197545.4AppointedBishop of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 May 197645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Apr 197948.7AppointedBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Aug 198858.0DiedBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for André Ilunga Kaseba
Bishop André Ilunga Kaseba (born , died ) Bishop of Kalemie-Kirungu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePweto

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast