Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kilwa-Kasenga

Dioecesis Kilvaensis-Kasengaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 4 August 1977
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 54,000 (20,857 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kilwakasenga.net/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 74, Kilwa [par Lubumbashi], Rep. Democratique du Congo; c/o Procure de Missions Don Bosco, Wespelaarsebaan 250, 3190 Boortmeerbeek, Belgique
  • Telephone: (099)804.14.08

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Moero
8 July 1948ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Moero (erected)
Diocese of Kilwa
24 August 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lac Moero Diocese of Kilwa
24 April 1971Territory LostDiocese of Baudouinville
Diocese of Kilwa
Diocese of Kongolo
Diocese of Manono (erected)
Diocese of Kilwa-Kasenga
4 August 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Kilwa Diocese of Kilwa-Kasenga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Moero
195010,50667,46515.6%14147508ap1951
Diocese of Kilwa
196931,419122,50025.6%719261,208243116ap1971
Diocese of Kilwa-Kasenga
1980109,671255,33143.0%317205,483214419ap1981
1990134,030353,77037.9%611177,884203870ap1991
1999143,362415,62334.5%178255,734104382ap2000
2000147,828440,24933.6%238314,768104180ap2001
2001148,357491,43530.2%328403,708114181ap2002
2002130,200441,71629.5%1910294,489123714ap2003
2003128,000440,00029.1%168245,33393014ap2004
2004130,000450,00028.9%167235,65282214ap2005
2006131,147411,47431.9%207274,85793014ap2007
2013247,221564,00043.8%2315386,505203918ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015