Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Christophe Amade Aloma, M. Afr.

Bishop of Kalemie-Kirungu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1961 BornMune
8 Dec 198928.8ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
25 Jul 199029.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
31 Mar 201554.2AppointedBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Jun 201554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Christophe Amade Aloma:
Bishop Jean-Christophe Amade Aloma M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Kalemie-Kirungu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalemie-Kirungu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2015
  • name/prof/op: CB, 1 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 17 May 2015
  • c2: CB, 27 May 2015
  • c3: CB, 12 Jun 2015
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015