Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kasongo

Dioecesis Kasongoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Placide Lubamba Ndjibu, M. Afr., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bukavu
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 75,365 (29,109 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 39, Kasongo [par Kindu], Manyema, Rep. Democratique du Congo

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasongo
10 January 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasongo (erected)
Diocese of Kasongo
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kasongo Diocese of Kasongo
16 April 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Bukavu
Diocese of Kasongo
Diocese of Uvira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kasongo
1970115,438485,00023.8%734412,81553253ap1971
1980160,000650,00024.6%435394,102424215ap1981
1990176,959630,29528.1%939483,686484816ap1991
1999220,000900,00024.4%1726435,116414316ap2000
2000230,000900,00025.6%225278,518193915ap2001
2001240,000900,00026.7%2113347,058251515ap2002
2002293,840900,00032.6%2219417,166311815ap2003
2003336,9501,050,00032.1%2519447,657292015ap2004
2004230,000900,00025.6%2313366,388231714ap2005
2006298,675965,00031.0%2714417,284232415ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Jun 2014