Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Léopold Huys, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}

Titular Bishop of Rusicade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1871BornBruges, Belgium
21 Sep 189524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
24 Mar 190937.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Mar 190937.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusicade
12 Apr 190937.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusicade
8 Oct 193867.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Léopold Huys:
Bishop Auguste-Léopold Huys M. Afr. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013