Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kongolo

Dioecesis Kongoloensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Oscar Ngoy wa Mpanga, C.S.Sp., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 44,206 (17,074 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 274, Kongolo, Katanga, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)48.26.265

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}
30 June 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}
18 June 1935ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Kongolo
8 March 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kongolo
23 April 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kongolo
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
Vicariate Apostolic of Kindu (erected)
Diocese of Kongolo
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kongolo Diocese of Kongolo
24 April 1971Territory LostDiocese of Baudouinville
Diocese of Kilwa
Diocese of Kongolo
Diocese of Manono (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Katanga {Katanga Settentrionale}
195044,058254,00017.3%24547937573311ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kongolo
Diocese of Kongolo
197079,790395,00020.2%32322,493374015ap1971
198079,280340,00023.3%2316392,032185112ap1981
1990107,689444,00024.3%1515303,5891610515ap1991
1997133,838564,00023.7%374413,264711514ap2002
2003148,033603,03024.5%332354,22938114ap2004
2004135,350700,00019.3%353383,56157314ap2005
2006253,000750,00033.7%374416,17057414ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012