Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Borgia Sedej

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia e Gradisca

Titular Archbishop of Aegina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1854BornCerkno
26 Aug 187722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
20 Jan 190651.3SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
21 Feb 190651.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
25 Mar 190651.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
23 Oct 193177.0RetiredArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
23 Oct 193177.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aegina
28 Nov 1931³77.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Borgia Sedej:
Archbishop Franz Borgia Sedej (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013