Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Walland

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1763³BornNeudorf
7 Nov 178926.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Nov 178926.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181855.1SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
2 Oct 181855.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
22 Nov 181855.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
11 May 183471.3DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Walland:
Archbishop Joseph Walland (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,371
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013