Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Michael von Attems (Attembs)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1711³Born
6 Jan 173725.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 175039.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
24 Aug 175039.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
3 Jan 175240.4SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
24 Apr 175240.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy
18 Feb 1774³62.6DiedArchbishop of Gorizia (Görz), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Michael von Attems (Attembs)
Archbishop Karl Michael von Attems (Attembs) (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia (Görz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227, and Page 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,750, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast