Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Flapp

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč i Pula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1845BornCormons
17 Sep 186823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
19 Sep 186823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
28 Oct 188439.5SelectedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
13 Nov 188439.5ConfirmedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
4 Jan 188539.7Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
27 Dec 191267.6DiedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Flapp
Bishop Giovanni Battista Flapp (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč i Pula

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016