Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Mahnič

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1850Born
30 Aug 187423.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189646.2AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
7 Feb 189746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
14 Dec 192070.2DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Anton Mahnič (VIAF: 32798590)
Bishop Anton Mahnič (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRobdilj, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
Ordained BishopGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017