Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Robert Zinkula

Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1957 Born
26 May 199033.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
19 Apr 201760.0AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
22 Jun 201760.1Ordained BishopBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Robert Zinkula
Bishop Thomas Robert Zinkula (born ) Bishop of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMount Vernon, IA, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Ordained PriestSt. Raphael, Cathedral, Dubuque, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Ordained BishopSt. John Vianney, Church, Bettendorf, IA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Davenport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017
  • c1/loc: CB, 19 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jun 2017