Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Michael Joensen

Bishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1960 Born
24 Jun 198928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
18 Jul 201959.0AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
27 Sep 201959.2Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for William Michael Joensen
Bishop William Michael Joensen (born ) Bishop of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterloo, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Ordained BishopSt. Francis of Assisi, Church, West Des Moines, Diocese of Des Moines, Iowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Des Moines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2019
  • mn/ob: CB, 18 Jul 2019
  • c2: CB, 19 Aug 2019
  • c34: CB, 19 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 Sep 2019

Quantcast