Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos Alberto Sánchez

Archbishop-Elect of Tucumán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1963 Born
24 Jun 198825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tucumán, Argentina
23 Aug 201754.3AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
13 Oct 201754.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Sánchez
Father Carlos Alberto Sánchez (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel de Tucumán, Archdiocese of Tucumán
Ordained BishopClub Atlético Tucumán, Tucumán, Archdiocese of Tucumán

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Tucumán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2017
  • c1: CB, 23 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Aug 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Sep 2017
  • c34: CB, 5 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Sep 2017