Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Załuski

Apostolic Nuncio to Malaysia

Titular Archbishop of Diocletiana

Apostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam

Apostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1960 Born
1 Jun 198525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
15 Jul 201454.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
15 Jul 201454.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Diocletiana
9 Aug 201454.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Diocletiana
29 Sep 202060.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malaysia
29 Sep 202060.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
29 Sep 202060.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Załuski
Archbishop Wojciech Załuski (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Malaysia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaluski-Lipnewo, Diocese of Łomża, Poland
Ordained PriestSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral Basilica, Łomża, Diocese of Łomża, Poland
Ordained BishopSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral Basilica, Łomża, Diocese of Łomża, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Malaysia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 8 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,262
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast