Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Yeh Sheng-nan

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Algeria

Titular Archbishop of Leptis Magna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1941 BornKaohsiung, Taiwan
27 Mar 197129.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 199857.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leptis Magna
10 Nov 199857.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka
20 Dec 199857.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Leptis Magna
22 Apr 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Algeria
22 Apr 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tunisia
2015²73.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Algeria
2015²73.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Tunisia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Yeh Sheng-nan
Archbishop Thomas Yeh Sheng-nan (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Algeria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Algeria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,451
  • r: CB, 3 Sep 2015
  • r: CB, 10 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016