Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Taipei

Archidioecesis Taipehensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Hung Shan-chuan, S.V.D., Archbishop
  • Joseph Cheng Tsai-fa, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Joseph Ti-kang, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 7 August 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Taiwan
  • Square Kilometers: 4,600 (1,776 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic.org.tw/taipei/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 94 Loli Road, Taipei 10679, Taiwan R.O.C.
  • Telephone: (02)2737-1311
  • Fax: 2737-3710

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Taipei
30 December 1949ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa) Prefecture Apostolic of Taipei (erected)
Archdiocese of Taipei
7 August 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Taipei Archdiocese of Taipei
21 March 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Taipei Diocese of Hsinchu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Taipei
19502,3152,653,457.1%7714165633ap1951
Archdiocese of Taipei
197050,4123,383,8451.5%80212292172249337130ap1971
198050,1053,873,0001.3%73205278180258429123ap1981
199074,3486,274,3481.2%79192271274267410123ap1991
199981,5476,960,5991.2%6319926231133539697ap2000
200082,0147,002,4341.2%6519325831728739596ap2001
200182,4807,077,3661.2%6219125332630740694ap2002
200282,9037,100,8191.2%6323930227433437494ap2003
200383,3837,138,8591.2%6222528729028842096ap2004
200483,8937,159,1981.2%6021527530531542095ap2005
201038,0377,331,027.5%5919225115125036793ap2011
201442,9637,474,815.6%5219624817329639293ap2015
201745,1897,504,500.6%3719022719925843993ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Mar 2019

Quantcast