Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano

Dioecesis Itabirensis-Fabriciannensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marco Aurélio Gubiotti, Bishop
  • Odilon Guimarães Moreira, Bishop Emeritus
  • Lélis Lara, C.SS.R., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 1 June 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mariana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 8,996 (3,474 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Coronel Linhares Guerra 100, 35900-020 Itabira, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (031)3831-3614
  • Fax: 3831-3675

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Itabira
14 June 1965ErectedArchdiocese of Diamantina
Archdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Itabira (erected)
Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano
1 June 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Itabira Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano
24 May 1985Territory LostArchdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Governador Valadares
Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano
Diocese of Guanhães (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Itabira
1965354,352.0%321345039ap1967
1970300,000370,00081.1%39397,692214347ap1971
1976380,000430,54588.3%1821399,7432410546ap1977
Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano
1980628,000721,00087.1%20163617,4442010033ap1981
1990734,000914,00080.3%16183421,588216936ap1991
1998640,000800,00080.0%31225312,0751273636ap2001
1999640,000800,00080.0%30225212,3071273636ap2000
2001600,000800,00075.0%33215411,111404840ap2002
2002600,000800,00075.0%34215510,909404840ap2003
2003600,000800,00075.0%34215510,909404841ap2004
2004496,798728,91768.2%3521568,871305441ap2005
2006509,000746,00068.2%3921608,483345742ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013