Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyril John Vogel

Deceased

Bishop of Salina, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1905Born
7 Jun 193126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Mar 195146.1IncardinatedPriest of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Apr 196560.2AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
17 Jun 196560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
25 Jun 196560.4InstalledBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
4 Oct 197974.7DiedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Cyril John Vogel
Bishop Cyril John Vogel (born , died ) Bishop of Salina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestPittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopBlessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Greensburg, PA, Diocese of Greensburg, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceSalina, Diocese of Salina, Kansas

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast