Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Ramon Prego Casal

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Clara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1927Born
17 Apr 195527.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
13 Nov 197043.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
13 Nov 197043.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia
14 Jan 197143.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia
24 Jul 197143.7AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba
1 Apr 199567.4AppointedBishop of Santa Clara, Cuba
9 Jan 199971.1DiedBishop of Santa Clara, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Fernando Ramon Prego Casal:
Bishop Fernando Ramon Prego Casal (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Clara

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015