Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)

Kottayamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mathew Moolakkattu, O.S.B., Archbishop
  • Jose Pandarassery, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Kuriakose Kunnacherry, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

(none)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archeparchy
  • Elevated: 12 May 2005
  • Metropolitan See
  • Syro-Malabarese Catholic Church of the Chaldean Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 560,665 (216,556 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://kottayamdiocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 71, Kottayam 686001, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0481)56.3527
  • Fax: 56.3327

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)
29 August 1911ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
21 December 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese) Eparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)
Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)
12 May 2005ElevatedEparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese) Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)
2009162,8183,688,8004.4%146882346951231,166151ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Mar 2013