Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alangaram Arockia Sebastian Durairaj, S.V.D.

Bishop of Khandwa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1957 Born
12 Jun 198427.1Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
8 May 198528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 May 200952.0AppointedBishop of Khandwa, India
16 Jul 200952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Khandwa, India

MicroData Summary for Alangaram Arockia Sebastian Durairaj
Bishop Alangaram Arockia Sebastian Durairaj S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Khandwa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThirunagar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Khandwa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast