Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Callori di Vignale

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1890Born
16 Dec 191727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
15 Feb 196574.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maiuca
21 Feb 196574.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Maiuca
22 Feb 196574.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196574.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
10 Aug 197180.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana

MicroData Summary for Federico Callori di Vignale
Federico Cardinal Callori di Vignale (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVignale Monferrato

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast