Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Pedicini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avellino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1883BornFoglianise
25 May 190724.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 193956.3AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
8 Oct 193956.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
22 Nov 194966.6AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
2 Jun 196784.2RetiredBishop of Avellino, Italy
2 Jun 196784.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
6 Jan 197692.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
15 Jan 198096.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Pedicini:
Bishop Gioacchino Pedicini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avellino

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1939, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013