Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agapito Simeoni

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1914Born
16 Jul 193924.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 197257.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Avellino, Italy
24 Apr 197257.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
11 Jun 197257.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
9 May 197459.5AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
9 May 197459.5AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
2 Jan 197661.1DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agapito Simeoni
Bishop Agapito Simeoni (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca di Cave
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast