Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Pellecchia

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1909BornPicarelli
25 Jul 193223.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 196050.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alife, Italy
2 Jan 196050.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
13 Mar 196051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
1 Sep 196152.5AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
19 Mar 196758.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy
19 Mar 196758.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arpi
28 Jun 197162.3AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
30 Jul 197263.4SucceededArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
3 May 197768.2DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Pellecchia:
Archbishop Raffaele Pellecchia (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015