Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eurico dos Santos Veloso

Archbishop Emeritus of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1933 BornSanandira
22 Sep 196229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Mar 198753.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Mar 198753.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
5 Jul 198754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
22 May 199158.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 May 199461.1SucceededBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Nov 200168.6AppointedArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Jan 200975.8RetiredArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eurico dos Santos Veloso:
Archbishop Eurico dos Santos Veloso (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Juiz de Fora

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013