Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hélio Gonçalves Heleno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caratinga, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1935BornCipotânea
3 Dec 196126.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 197843.5AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Feb 197943.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Feb 201175.7RetiredBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Sep 201277.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hélio Gonçalves Heleno:
Bishop Hélio Gonçalves Heleno (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caratinga

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013