Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Francisco Machado

Bishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1952 BornAndorinhas
11 Dec 197725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 May 200451.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 May 200451.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
25 Jul 200451.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caliabria
2 Jan 200855.2AppointedBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Francisco Machado:
Bishop Paulo Francisco Machado (born ) Bishop of Uberlândia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uberlândia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,659
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013