Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred John Markiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1928Born
6 Jun 195325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Apr 195728.8IncardinatedPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
1 Jul 198658.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
1 Jul 198658.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
17 Sep 198658.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
22 Nov 199466.5AppointedBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
31 Jan 199566.7InstalledBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
8 Jan 199768.6DiedBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred John Markiewicz
Bishop Alfred John Markiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Kalamazoo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Death PlaceHuntington, NY
Buried Place (Original)St. John, Cemetery, Middle Village, NY

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Number 8,457
  • loc: CB, 7 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Oct 2021

Quantcast