Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Uga Orgah

Deceased

Bishop of Otukpo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1953BornAdim Akpa
16 Mar 197926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Otukpo, Nigeria
10 Jul 199542.3AppointedBishop of Otukpo, Nigeria
28 Oct 199542.6Ordained BishopBishop of Otukpo, Nigeria
7 Dec 200047.7DiedBishop of Otukpo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Uga Orgah:
Bishop Fidelis Uga Orgah (born , died ) Bishop of Otukpo

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,703
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2000, Page 552
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013