Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nelson Jair Cardona Ramírez

Bishop of San José del Guaviare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1969 BornNorcasia
12 Dec 199223.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia
7 May 201647.3AppointedBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
18 Jun 201647.4Ordained BishopBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
9 Jul 201647.4InstalledBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Nelson Jair Cardona Ramírez
Bishop Nelson Jair Cardona Ramírez (born ) Bishop of San José del Guaviare

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San José del Guaviare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 May 2016
  • c2: CB, 25 May 2016
  • i: CB, 9 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,944
  • i: CB, 13 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Jul 2016