Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fausto Gabriel Trávez Trávez, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1941 BornToacazo
15 Oct 196524.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Dec 197029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Feb 200361.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador
1 Feb 200361.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
15 Mar 200362.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum
27 Mar 200867.0AppointedBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
24 May 200867.2InstalledBishop of Babahoyo, Ecuador
11 Sep 201069.5AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
22 Oct 201069.6InstalledArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Fausto Gabriel Trávez Trávez:
Archbishop Fausto Gabriel Trávez Trávez O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Quito

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Quito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014