Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Babahoyo

Dioecesis Babahoiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 22 August 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guayaquil
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 6,531 (2,522 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Cinco de Junio 1000 y Rocafuerte, Babahoyo [Los Rios], Ecuador
  • Telephone: (05)2732.691
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Los Ríos
15 July 1948ErectedDiocese of Guayaquil Vicariate Apostolic of Los Ríos (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Los Ríos
10 September 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Los Ríos Territorial Prelature of Los Ríos
Diocese of Babahoyo
22 August 1994ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Los Ríos Diocese of Babahoyo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Los Ríos
1949200,000200,000100.0%821020,00021720ap1951
Territorial Prelature of Los Ríos
1966238,500245,40097.2%1922111,35773912ap1967
1968328,004.0%220102012ap1971
1976350,000382,75091.4%1922116,66671016ap1977
1980357,000448,00079.7%1832117,0008916ap1981
1990492,000529,00093.0%1642024,60071217ap1991
Diocese of Babahoyo
1999648,000690,00093.9%2152624,92362020ap2000
2000648,000690,00093.9%2182922,34493220ap2001
2001698,400720,00097.0%2182924,08293221ap2002
2002705,000726,00097.1%24103420,735133221ap2003
2003698,400720,00097.0%25103519,954132721ap2004
2004635,100730,00087.0%26103617,641222721ap2005
2006555,000751,00073.9%2583316,818113621ap2007
2012601,000812,00074.0%2352821,46495125ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014