Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cuenca

Archidioecesis Conchensis in Aequatore



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 April 1957
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 9,672 (3,735 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdecuenca.org.ec/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 46, Carrera Bolivar 7-64 y Luis Cordero, Cuenca, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (07)284.72.34/5; 283.16.51
  • Fax: 284.44.36

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cuenca
1 July 1786ErectedDiocese of Quito Diocese of Cuenca (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
29 December 1862Territory LostDiocese of Cuenca Diocese of Loja (erected)
29 December 1862Territory LostDiocese of Cuenca Diocese of Bolivar (erected)
Archdiocese of Cuenca
9 April 1957ElevatedDiocese of Cuenca Archdiocese of Cuenca
26 June 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuenca Diocese of Azogues (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cuenca
1950498,000500,00099.6%104521563,1924720064ap1951
Archdiocese of Cuenca
1966370,000381,60297.0%91651562,37113435258ap1967
1970450,750450,758100.0%70511213,7257229348ap1971
1976364,952365,70499.8%54481023,5775630757ap1977
1980368,239369,89599.6%52501023,6105921958ap1981
1990600,000645,00093.0%52591115,40510134464ap1991
1999608,000653,00093.1%64411055,79010036671ap2000
2000619,000665,00093.1%65531185,24558636671ap2001
2001590,900635,40093.0%73521254,72789432470ap2002
2002627,000660,00095.0%72401125,59886327770ap2003
2003570,000599,54695.1%75391145,00066327174ap2004
2004595,388626,25095.1%78421204,96165931975ap2005
2006604,000635,00095.1%79391185,11865324578ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013