Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro de Giorgi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1858Born
1880²21.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Aug 192667.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Aug 192667.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
28 Oct 192668.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
27 Nov 193577.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro de Giorgi
Bishop Alessandro de Giorgi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • c2/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017