Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rossi, O.Ss.C.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1855Born
1877²21.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saints Ambrose and Charles
9 Jun 192267.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jun 192267.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
15 Aug 192267.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
21 Apr 193074.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rossi
Bishop Giovanni Rossi O.Ss.C.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 50
  • op: CB, 13 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast