Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Onufry Okęcki

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1729BornKobylin
23 Apr 175525.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 May 175525.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 177041.1SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
4 Mar 177141.7ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
14 Apr 177141.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
21 Mar 177545.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Poznań, Poland
29 May 177545.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Poznań, Poland
20 Mar 178050.7SucceededBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Jun 179364.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Onufry Okęcki:
Bishop Antoni Onufry Okęcki (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,763
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015