Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Teraszkiewicz

Deceased

Administrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Bishop of Bełz (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1793Born
1825²31.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 184148.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
30 Aug 184249.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
30 Aug 184249.3AppointedBishop of Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland
21 May 184350.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland
1851²57.6AppointedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1 Mar 186369.8DiedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
16 Mar 186369.8AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jan Teraszkiewicz
Bishop Jan Teraszkiewicz (born , died ) Administrator of Chełm

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chełm, Diocese of Chełm (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,057
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 23
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,826

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast