Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Klemens Gołaszewski

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1748BornTykocin
177122.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180556.5AppointedBishop of Wigry, Poland
5 Mar 180960.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wigry, Poland
30 Jun 181869.6AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
8 Mar 182071.2DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Klemens Gołaszewski:
Bishop Jan Klemens Gołaszewski (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 344, and Page 400
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015